Trustees DUNAMIS CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1153463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY ALICE LUNT Chair 16 July 2013
None on record
Karen Louise Hibbert Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Rosemary Blemmings Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Julie Ann Thompson Trustee 27 October 2023
None on record
Asa Andrew Hibbert Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
DAVID STEVEN LUNT Trustee 16 July 2013
None on record