Trustees COOPERS CHARITY CIO
Charity number: 1155094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Fyfe | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kevin Chapman | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Piers Llewelyn Jones | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan John Roberts | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alistair Phillip Hutchinson | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Cheale | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Julie-Ann Welham CBE | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Julian Day | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Miller MBE | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Helena Cooke | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Scott Edwards | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Leigh JOHNSON | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN FAHY | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
CLARE HUGHES OBE | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr IAN JAMES MACAULAY FROOD OBE | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PERRY BOUSFIELD | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
BILL SCOTT | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ROY EDWARD CAMPBELL | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Vivian Murray Bairstow MBE | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
IAN DAVID LUDER CBE | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.