Accounts and annual returns COGS PREPARES 4 LIFE CIO

Charity number: 1154296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 August 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window