COGS PREPARES 4 LIFE CIO

Charity number: 1154296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £21.32k £33.87k £14.41k £14.46k £19.21k
Total expenditure £14.79k £26.34k £22.29k £11.01k £21.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A