COGS PREPARES 4 LIFE CIO

Charity number: 1154296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM DAVID GRIFFITHS Trustee 26 February 2014 None on record
TONY WILKINS Trustee 15 August 2013 None on record
Rebecca Sarah Catherine Flynn Trustee 10 May 2019 None on record
John Edward Boyce Trustee 14 September 2018 None on record
LAUREL PAIGE CADMAN Chair 10 January 2020 None on record
Vivienne Smart Trustee 21 October 2016 None on record
Tracy Karen Blakey Trustee 30 November 2015 None on record
TERRENCE VICTOR FINN Trustee 15 August 2013 None on record