CLUB TIKVA

Charity number: 1153862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.46k £36.57k £38.53k £53.33k £63.48k
Total expenditure £33.60k £32.35k £38.84k £52.21k £47.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k