ASH RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide a permanent and holistic retirement home for horses, donkeys and other animals, whilst at the same time creating and sustaining habitats that encourage wildlife, birds and native plant species. We also aim to educate and inspire the public by example and through walks, talks and courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 12 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Marie Tomkinson | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Clare Rogers | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Christopher Irons | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Wilding | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.96k | £49.10k | £54.57k | £39.03k | £48.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.71k | £41.74k | £43.59k | £51.28k | £51.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.24k | £7.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 September 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/08/2013 as amended on 31 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1. For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of horses, ponies, donkeys, wildlife and other animals in need of care and attention and, in particular, to maintain a rescue home or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals. 2. To educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare. 3. To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment. 4. To advance the education of the public in the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment. 5. To relieve those in need (in particular but not limited to those with physical, mental, social or emotional disabilities or disadvantages) by providing equine assisted and outdoor educational activities that may also involve other animals.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ash Tree Farm
Ash
Dartmouth
TQ6 0LR
- Phone:
- 07825882913
- Email:
- ashrescuecentre@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window