JERRY GREEN DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1155042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.20m £1.23m £1.12m £1.40m £1.69m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.87m £2.13m £2.68m £2.47m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £139.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £830.91k £739.86k £655.90k £856.29k £1.32m
Income - Other trading activities £40.08k £93.32k £141.64k £160.98k £165.62k
Income - Charitable activities £49.51k £68.19k £54.22k £58.61k £18.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £298.62k £0
Income - Investment £258.03k £288.33k £239.94k £225.70k £133.84k
Income - Other £20.25k £36.35k £29.48k £94.03k £49.02k
Income - Legacies £436.63k £334.70k £113.27k £557.67k £859.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.63m £1.81m £1.93m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.54k £121.22k £324.87k £274.38k £415.65k
Expenditure - Governance £37.94k £49.75k £62.54k £19.01k £194.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £38.02k £40.99k £39.43k £34.82k £29.14k
Expenditure - Other £0 £117.56k £0 £473.01k £0