BRIGHT LIGHTS PROJECTS

Charity number: 1153637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 May 2019 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 May 2019 111 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download