BARNSLEY FOOD BANK PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1153906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £77.47k £12.97k £25.33k £50.29k £84.26k
Total expenditure £46.37k £41.21k £39.76k £41.88k £55.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A