WALTON COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At our core we are a Library serving the Community of Walton and wider the communities of Wakefield. We also act as a community 'hub' and run a variety of clubs and courses such as Story Club for Children, Work Club assisting job seekers, Computing4Dummies, Access Info Point for Wakefield District Housing tenants, Book Club, Cycling Club, Ancestry course.................
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 17 November 2013: CIO registration
- WCL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MORAN | Chair | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Penney | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Smith | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Heigham | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN BRYAN HARVEY | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.37k | £12.04k | £11.20k | £20.35k | £18.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.47k | £10.56k | £9.55k | £20.13k | £18.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 17 NOV 2013 AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF WAKEFIELD IN WEST YORKSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS, BY THE RUNNING AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR LEARNING AND INDIVIDUAL SKILLS DEVELOPMENT INCLUDING THE CULTIVATION OF ARTS AND ART ACTIVITIES AND RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID RESIDENTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Almond Avenue
Walton
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
Charles Waterton House
WF2 6UA
- Phone:
- 01924 917627
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window