SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1154806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW FANE Chair 01 October 2013
THE SUFFOLK PUNCH TRUST Received: On time
THE CHILD HEALTH RESEARCH CIO Received: On time
Jessica de Grazia Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
BOB KINDRED MBE Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
RALPH CARPENTER Trustee 05 June 2015
THE BOXTED AND HARTEST INSTITUTE Received: On time
ROBERT TOWNSHEND Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
JACQUELINE ANNE WARD Trustee 08 June 2018 None on record
Rev TONY REDMAN Trustee 16 June 2017
GREAT LIVERMERE VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL Received: 145 days late
LOIS HUNT Trustee 03 June 2016
HEVENINGHAM HALL COUNTRY FAIR TRUST Received: On time
DR Jess Tipper Trustee 16 June 2017 None on record
NICHOLAS PEARSON OBE Trustee 05 June 2015
THE SUFFOLK HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST