Financial history CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1156033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £843.58k £894.46k £807.15k £802.66k £917.69k
Total expenditure £895.07k £972.82k £868.63k £848.09k £998.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £100.15k £453.89k £247.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £33.99k £59.88k £131.54k £468.73k £273.81k
Income - Other trading activities £538.05k £581.09k £424.81k £139.44k £421.74k
Income - Charitable activities £98.37k £94.22k £86.05k £46.45k £63.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.06k £159.27k £164.75k £148.04k £158.95k
Income - Other £163.11k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.28k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £416.25k £502.04k £421.01k £387.55k £540.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £478.82k £470.78k £447.62k £460.54k £458.23k
Expenditure - Governance £23.97k £41.83k £20.87k £26.74k £28.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0