Trustees CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1156033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carmen D'Cruz Chair 11 November 2018
None on record
Dr Clare Georgina Stainthorp Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Lucas Marshall Whittaker Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Laurence Lodge Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Theo Roelandts Gott Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Dr Oskar Cox Jensen Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Rahima Junna Begum Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Adam Ramejkis Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Lorna Deloris Beckford Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
KATHERINE BEVAN Trustee 13 November 2016
TEENTECH CHARITY
Received: On time
Martin Robbins Trustee 09 November 2014
None on record
ROBERT JOHN CHURCHILL Trustee 09 November 2014
None on record