THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN WITH ST MARTIN, YORK

Charity number: 1153456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 July 2016 On time Download