Financial history FULL FACT

Charity number: 1158683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.08m £669.29k £2.34m £2.32m £2.45m
Total expenditure £752.02k £911.65k £1.56m £2.03m £2.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £585.06k £443.07k £1.73m £1.88m £1.90m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £450.80k £214.31k £598.22k £437.26k £545.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1 £0
Income - Other £43.16k £11.92k £6.25k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £752.02k £911.65k £1.56m £1.96m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £70.50k £181.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £13.50k £0 £192
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0