FULL FACT

Charity number: 1158683
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/09/2014 as amended on 18 Mar 2020

Charitable objects

THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF CRIME, HEALTH, IMMIGRATION, ECONOMY, EDUCATION, ENVIRONMENT AND SOCIAL WELFARE, THROUGH EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND TRAINING, USING SUCH EXPERTISE (LEGAL OR OTHERWISE) AND ADVICE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND INFORM PUBLIC DEBATE IN THOSE FIELDS WHETHER IN THE UK OR ABROAD AND IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC, THROUGH A PROCESS OF OBJECTIVE, IMPARTIAL RESEARCH AND RIGOROUS FACTUAL ANALYSIS, FULL, ACCURATE AND RELEVANT INFORMATION TO ASSIST SUCH PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND TO INFORM AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF PUBLIC DEBATE. SUCH PURPOSES SHALL IN ALL RESPECTS AND AT ALL TIMES BE CONSTRUED AND PROMOTED: (I) IN AN IMPARTIAL, OBJECTIVE, BALANCED AND INDEPENDENT MANNER OBSERVING STRICT POLITICAL NEUTRALITY AND, TO THE EXTENT THAT SUCH PRINCIPLES MAY BE APPLIED TO SUCH PURPOSES, CONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPLES ENUNCIATED IN THE CODE OF PRACTICE FOR OFFICIAL STATISTICS; (II) EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW RELATING TO CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES. THE FIELDS OF EDUCATION MAY BE EXTENDED IN SO FAR AS SUCH FIELDS ARE CONSONANT WITH CHARITY LAW AND SUBJECT TO THE TRUSTEES' UNANIMOUS APPROVAL AND THE CHARITY COMMISSION'S CONSENT.