Financial history NORTH LONDON WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £935.61k £1.19m £1.87m £2.22m £3.50m
Total expenditure £918.90k £1.16m £1.77m £2.19m £3.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £935.61k £1.19m £1.87m £2.22m £3.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £917.77k £1.16m £1.77m £2.19m £3.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.08k £6.19k £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £199.81k £253.38k £515.92k £633.78k £1.04m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.13k £0 £0 £0 £0