POOLE AFRICA LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Humanitarian and medical teaching link between Poole Hospital NHS Foundation Trust and nominated hospitals/training institutes in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 23 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANTOINETTE HAZEL MCAULAY MD FRCPCH | Chair | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILARY FENTON-HARRIS | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pasco Thomas James Hearn MBBS MRCP | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Neil McEwan MBChB | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mella MBBs FRCS | Trustee | 10 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr FRANCES MARY DORMON MB BS FRCA | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.25k | £18.88k | £34.45k | £27.10k | £70.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.73k | £11.51k | £26.35k | £37.18k | £57.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.84k | £6.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Aug 2013 as amended on 13 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
Objects • To advance and sustain an education and training programme based at Lira University, Lira regional referral hospital and Lira University hospital designed to improve the health care of the people of, Uganda and in particular Lira • To sustain an ongoing programme to bring healthcare professionals from Uganda to the UK for observation and training placements • To work closely with other agencies and organisations such as THET, Bournemouth University and other Wessex Links to promote improvements in healthcare, education and research at Lira University, Lira regional referral hospital and Lira University hospital • To support the development of healthcare facilities including the provision of medical equipment to enhance healthcare facilities at Lira University, Lira regional referral hospital and lira University hospital • To advance and sustain education and training programmes and the development of health care facilities (including the provision of medical equipment) at such places as the Trustees may decide in other African countries • Following our long term involvement with Wau teaching hospital and schools of nursing in Wau, this link is now on standby due to the political instability of the country and the resulting potential dangers to visiting staff. We are committed to retain a close contact with our medical colleagues and the ministry of Health in South Sudan. • To continue to support the work of Sister Gracy though the Mary Help School of nursing and her feeding programme in Wau.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PEOPLE OF SOUTH SUDAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Poole Hospital NHS Trust
Longfleet Road
POOLE
BH15 2JB
- Phone:
- 01202448182
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window