SHALHEVES

Charity number: 1155424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £37.50k £10.08k £25.57k £32.10k £24.02k
Total expenditure £31.25k £18.11k £25.69k £31.51k £19.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A