EALING FOODBANK

Charity number: 1156369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 June 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 June 2020 26 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 June 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 June 2019 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 19 April 2017 On time Download