GATEWAY CHURCH, MORECAMBE

Charity number: 1154420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time Download