Financial history ALFORD CORN EXCHANGE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1154929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £71.76k £45.01k £73.42k £60.49k £117.30k
Total expenditure £40.37k £32.18k £93.90k £63.05k £144.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £4.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.00k