AGENDER EDUCATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 18 March 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
aGender helps young people from the most deprived wards of Hastings and St. Leonards to thrive beyond the constraints of stereotypes. We deliver creative media projects with young people to help open up critical thinking and encourage positive expression. Their work is exhibited, performed or screened locally to encourage a sense of pride in their achievements and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 January 2014: CIO registration
- AGENDER (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Insley | Chair | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Radice | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Kendall Beaudry | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Vice | Trustee | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372 | £31 | £22 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.49k | £295 | £392 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 March 2025 | 777 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 March 2025 | 777 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 23 JAN 2014 AMENDED ON 24 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF CREATIVE ACTIVITIES RELATING TO HEALTH AND WELLBEING, RELATIONSHIPS AND IDENTITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Virgins Lane
BATTLE
East Sussex
TN33 0JH
- Phone:
- 07775842882
- Email:
- info@agender.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window