CHLOES (HORSHAM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trading in Chloe's(Horsham) to raise funds to support:- The Salvation Army's Hope In project in Horsham, (?20,000) The Phoenix Club, a local Stroke support group,(?12,000) The ARK Horsham, Drug and substance abuse group (?3,000) The Sussex Kidney Trust (?3,000) The Oasis Pregnancy Centre (?2000) Horsham Debt Advice Centre (?4000) Queen Elizabeth School, Horsham (?5000)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- CHLOES (Previous name)
- CHLOES(HORSHAM) (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.33k | £129.74k | £126.29k | £34.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.52k | £127.57k | £103.81k | £93.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 03 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | 03 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 27 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | 27 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 19 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | 19 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 13 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | 13 February 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- A) RELIEF OF POVERTY BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) :- I) PROVISION OF FINANCE TO THE SALVATION ARMY'S "HOPE IN PROJECT" AND COMMUNITY LUNCHES. II) PROVISION OF FINANCE LOCAL COMMUNITY GROUPS SATISFYING CHARITABLE OBJECTS. III) PROVISION OF ITEMS TO PERSONS IN NEED EG CLOTHING, BEDDING AND FOOD. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE DEBT MANAGEMNET ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE. C) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE AND USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window