OPEN MINDS COUNSELLING SERVICE LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling and talking therapies for adults and children, on any issue and for as long as it is useful Group, family, relationship and anger-management therapy Training and mentoring on psychological well-being to the public (one to one or in groups) Training to professionals on specialist counselling and therapeutic interventions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Doncaster
Governance
- 23 December 2013: Standard registration
- 01 November 2023: Funds received from 1101544 DONCASTER DISABLED PEOPLES ALLIANCE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Morgan | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Harris | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG SOBIECKI | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE GREEN | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.20k | £202.00k | £195.08k | £309.48k | £211.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.21k | £180.73k | £186.15k | £226.62k | £229.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £52.20k | £52.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 April 2022 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 April 2022 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RELATION TO MENTAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND TRAINING TO ADULTS AND CHILDREN IN ORDER TO PROVIDE THE BEST SERVICE POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANAGING DIRECTOR
OPEN MINDS COUNSELLING SERVICE LTD.
28 CHRIST CHURCH ROAD
DONCASTER
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
DN12QL
- Phone:
- 07765224564
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window