Accounts and annual returns LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM

Charity number: 1158175
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 April 2022 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window