Financial history LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM

Charity number: 1158175
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £50.77k £38.16k £58.46k £57.73k £45.61k
Total expenditure £58.93k £52.98k £64.67k £56.77k £33.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.90k £28.49k £43.41k £28.45k £37.00k