Financial history HEALTHWATCH CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1154627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £154.42k £149.77k £161.18k £156.11k £153.67k
Total expenditure £140.70k £150.15k £167.74k £161.08k £141.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £140.00k £144.20k £144.20k £144.20k £151.41k