HORNSEA FLORAL HALL

Charity number: 1154950
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 December 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 03 December 2020 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 13 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 10 November 2016 On time Download