HORNSEA FLORAL HALL

Charity number: 1154950
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £99.81k £195.34k £97.72k £101.93k £118.12k
Total expenditure £56.91k £89.40k £117.71k £59.29k £80.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £60.48k £104.54k £6.00k N/A N/A