Financial history HARLOW & WEST ESSEX LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1154685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £73.52k £107.88k £147.16k £198.22k £235.37k
Total expenditure £65.97k £114.51k £141.96k £174.23k £223.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £815 £11.47k £12.06k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A