Accounts and annual returns GOSHALLA IN LEICESTER

Charity number: 1153839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 July 2020 16 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2019 16 June 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2018 23 September 2019 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2017 07 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2017 Not Required