Financial history GOSHALLA IN LEICESTER

Charity number: 1153839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/07/2018 07/07/2019 07/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £2.05k £9.19k £5.13k £40.49k £66.39k
Total expenditure £5.01k £12.47k £4.38k £4.38k £28.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A