Trustees USWSU
Charity number: 1153572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Williams | Chair | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Cadwallader | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Main MBE | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Marie Williams | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mamhende | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Josef Walsh | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Tariro Chingosho | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenul Mandisa Navindu Herath | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sofia de Zulueta Soberon | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamal Abdilahi | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.