Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, WINCHESTER
Charity number: 1153845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ed Dines | Chair | 06 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Stuart Rawlings | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Nina Newman | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Martin Harrison | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Anthony Atherton | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stevens | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion May Fletcher | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HARRISON | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Pamela Margaret Clark | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Anderson | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Claire Hellawell | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DOUGLAS HOBBY | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.