Financial history INDUS HEALTH NETWORK

Charity number: 1154809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £173.16k £748.19k £823.83k £1.47m £1.24m
Total expenditure £181.30k £660.22k £630.96k £1.06m £1.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £748.19k £823.83k £1.47m £1.24m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £0 £552.85k £952.44k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £660.22k £78.11k £103.49k £155.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £24.57k £25.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £860.21k £1.05m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0