Financial history LA FONDATION DES SAVANES OUEST-AFRICAINES

Charity number: 1153809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £459.66k £635.37k £507.29k £4.13m £2.16m
Total expenditure £280.07k £694.66k £1.28m £3.73m £1.58m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.23m £10.15m £3.77m £1.35m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £1.10m £10.15m £201.96k £0
Income - Investment N/A £512.51k £507.29k £561.83k £804.72k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £527.91k £1.12m £3.54m £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £166.75k £165.05k £191.69k £219.28k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.20k £27.14k £20.33k £21.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £415.01k £920.77k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £166.75k £165.05k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0