THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH, WHICHFORD

Charity number: 1154511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.00k £13.30k £6.24k £3.84k £6.21k
Total expenditure £862 £4.50k £1.25k £1.02k £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A