THE VILLAGE CHURCH FARM

Charity number: 1156143
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is the promotion and advancement of the education of the public in the history, culture and heritage of The Church Farm Museum and of the county of Lincolnshire and surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £49,037
Total expenditure: £57,319

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darrell Wayne Derrick Bangs Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Karl Crawford Trustee 31 January 2020
None on record
Trevor Oliver Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Stanley Charles Garner-Jones Trustee 23 February 2017
None on record
Michael Peter Walton Trustee 10 February 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £50.63k £20.13k £68.61k £36.05k £49.04k
Total expenditure £53.84k £21.20k £17.08k £17.64k £57.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 May 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 01 May 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 June 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 June 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 October 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 October 2020 161 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Village Church Farm
Church Road South
SKEGNESS
PE25 2HF
Phone:
01754766658