FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S (MARKET WEIGHTON)

Charity number: 1153999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 September 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 September 2020 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 August 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required