GATEHOUSE - CARING IN EAST ANGLIA

Charity number: 1154412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £199.01k £299.59k £325.98k £287.45k
Total expenditure £0 £237.38k £229.05k £231.12k £248.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £8.00k £24.24k £19.20k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £15.00k £10.00k £12.00k