CHORLEYWOOD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All our activities are for older people in our area to encourage learning, physical and social activities in later life : We arrange and organise educational study groups, lectures, educational outings, memory courses, first aid courses, physical activities (walking, pilates, tai chi), quizzes, concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 September 2013: Standard registration
- CHORLEYWOOD U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Francis Pell | Chair | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
jayne morgan | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
richard john edwards | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Eileen Morrison | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judi Shoffren | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Field | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Stansfield | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Carter | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Griggs | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.50k | £19.46k | £6.20k | £8.15k | £12.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.66k | £14.14k | £6.03k | £12.08k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 March 2021 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Shire Lane
Chorleywood
Rickmansworth
WD3 5NQ
- Phone:
- 019235637
- Email:
- chairman@cw-u3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window