THE STRETTONS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 504086
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 February 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 June 2018 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required