THE STRETTONS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 504086
Charity reporting is overdue by 260 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £593 £620 £578 £562 £996
Total expenditure £526 £526 £620 £776 £1.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A