FIRST ACT 2011

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Act 2011 aims to inspire people with learning difficulties to achieve their artistic ambitions through the use of Drama and other Performing Arts. This is facilitated through group instruction, practice and teaching skills associated with the Performing Arts, culminating in productions to live Theatre audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 16 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Edward Wright | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Patricia Domoney | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Eve Denness | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN LAIDLER | Trustee | 15 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Heather Humby MBE | Trustee | 15 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.79k | £20.13k | £50.73k | £63.77k | £80.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.88k | £17.45k | £52.38k | £67.29k | £85.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES THROUGH EXPLORATION AND ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA, OTHER PERFORMING ARTS AND THE ART OF STAGECRAFT TO ENABLE THEM TO REALIZE THEIR CREATIVE POTENTIAL AND THEREBY GAIN CONFIDENCE, SELF-ESTEEM AND INDIVIDUALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19B Grove Road
SANDOWN
Isle Of Wight
PO36 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01983408184
- Email:
- laidlercarol@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window