Financial history CEO SLEEPOUT

Charity number: 1154963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £710.87k £463.26k £475.63k £489.71k £140.02k
Total expenditure £249.24k £391.91k £579.10k £1.04m £155.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £237.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £332.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £378.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £172 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £249.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A