UNIVERSITY MENTAL HEALTH ADVISERS NETWORK (UMHAN)

Charity number: 1155038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 03 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download