UNIVERSITY MENTAL HEALTH ADVISERS NETWORK (UMHAN)

Charity number: 1155038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.48k £21.03k £35.28k £37.85k £34.10k
Total expenditure £9.51k £21.16k £27.31k £21.99k £34.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A