Financial history COMMUNITY EMERGENCY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £38.81k £22.96k £30.98k £40.44k £136.48k
Total expenditure £43.19k £31.81k £24.58k £31.79k £115.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £250 N/A N/A N/A